KS HB2345 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the office of the child advocate for children's protection and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the office of the child advocate for children's protection and services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Children and Seniors
2021-02-17HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
2021-02-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors
2021-02-10HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback