KS HB2340 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring actual SGF revenues in excess of the joint estimate of revenue to the budget stabilization fund and prescribing uses for moneys credited to such fund.
Title
Transferring actual SGF revenues in excess of the joint estimate of revenue to the budget stabilization fund and prescribing uses for moneys credited to such fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2340/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2340_00_0000.pdf |