KS HB2339 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the crime of election tampering to include changing or altering votes cast, manipulating computer hardware or software or vote tabulation methods or producing false vote totals.
Title
Expanding the crime of election tampering to include changing or altering votes cast, manipulating computer hardware or software or vote tabulation methods or producing false vote totals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-17 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finch |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2021-02-10 | House | House Introduced |