KS HB2337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making changes to the community corrections advisory boards and grant programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making changes to the community corrections advisory boards and grant programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S
2019-03-06HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2019-02-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback