KS HB2334 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the deadline for project agreements under the attracting powerful economic expansion act, enhancing incentives for qualified suppliers and adding a new employee relocation reimbursement incentive for qualified suppliers, limiting the corporate income tax rate reduction provision to two rate reductions and permitting qualified firms and qualified suppliers to participate in other economic development programs for new projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the deadline for project agreements under the attracting powerful economic expansion act, enhancing incentives for qualified suppliers and adding a new employee relocation reimbursement incentive for qualified suppliers, limiting the corporate income tax rate reduction provision to two rate reductions and permitting qualified firms and qualified suppliers to participate in other economic development programs for new projects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2023-03-01HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2023-02-15HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-14HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
2023-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2023-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback