KS HB2331 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2331 by Committee on Government, Technology and Security - Enacting the representative Jim Morrison cybersecurity act and establishing the Kansas information technology enterprise.
Title
Substitute for HB 2331 by Committee on Government, Technology and Security - Enacting the representative Jim Morrison cybersecurity act and establishing the Kansas information technology enterprise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 90 Nay: 28 (Y: 90 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Monday, March 27, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-03-20 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 90 Nay: 28 |
2017-03-20 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, March 17, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative DeGraaf was rejected |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative DeGraaf |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kelly was adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kelly |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sloan was rejected |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sloan |
2017-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2017-02-21 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2017-02-20 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Government, Technology and Security; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2017-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Government, Technology and Security |
2017-02-09 | House | House Introduced |