KS HB2330 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of state moneys distributed to local health departments.
Title
Increasing the amount of state moneys distributed to local health departments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 21, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 152-S |
2023-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Social Services Budget |
2023-02-07 | House | House Introduced |