KS HB2329 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the entities who are subject to the pipeline safety program of the state corporation commission.
Title
Updating the entities who are subject to the pipeline safety program of the state corporation commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 2, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 548-S |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-24 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications |
2021-02-10 | House | House Introduced |