KS HB2328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain military service that is concurrent with KPERS participating service to be credited as additional KPERS participating service.
Title
Requiring certain military service that is concurrent with KPERS participating service to be credited as additional KPERS participating service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELED |
2019-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-02-14 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2328/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2328_00_0000.pdf |