KS HB2326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments regarding license to carry a concealed handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amendments regarding license to carry a concealed handgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 83 Nay: 41
2019-03-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse Representative Arnberger raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
2019-03-26HouseHouse Representative Arnberger raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Clayton
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Woodard was rejected Yea: 47 Nay: 74
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Woodard
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Owens was adopted Yea: 74 Nay: 45
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Owens
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ballard was rejected Yea: 43 Nay: 75
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ballard
2019-03-26HouseHouse Representative Cox raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Stogsdill
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-02-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback