KS HB2321 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring electric public utilities to notify cities prior to construction of urban electric transmission lines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring electric public utilities to notify cities prior to construction of urban electric transmission lines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 8, 2021
2021-03-29HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 29, 2021
2021-03-23SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2021-03-18SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2021-03-17SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
2021-03-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2021-03-02SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-03-02HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
2021-03-02HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, March 1, 2021
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2021-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
2021-02-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2021-02-10HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2321/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2321_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2321_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2321_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2321_h_1448.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2321_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_hb_2321_2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2321_00_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210302110313_705718/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210323160428_215604/

Bill Comments 750

feedback