KS HB2317 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-26 - Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing expensing of investment expenditures as a deduction in calculating Kansas income tax liability and IMPACT program changes.
Title
Authorizing expensing of investment expenditures as a deduction in calculating Kansas income tax liability and IMPACT program changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-26 | Stricken from the Calendar (House Rule 2307) | |
2011-02-23 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Taxation | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced |