KS HB2315 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a tax credit for contributions to technical colleges.
Title
Providing a tax credit for contributions to technical colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 119 Nay: 4 (Y: 119 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-04 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 4 |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-10 | House | House Introduced |