KS HB2305 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Indigents' Defense Terms and Qualifications.
Title
Board of Indigents' Defense Terms and Qualifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2011-02-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-18 | Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced |