KS HB2295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-13HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-13HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback