KS HB2295 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute HB 2295 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources -- Amending hunting provisions concerning crossbows and deer hunting seasons.
Title
Substitute HB 2295 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources -- Amending hunting provisions concerning crossbows and deer hunting seasons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 101 Nay: 22 (Y: 101 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-02-22 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-22 | Engrossed on Wednesday, 22 February 2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 101 Nay: 22 | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Arpke was adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Arpke | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Meier was adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Meier | |
2012-02-21 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-02-17 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783 Docking | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced |