KS HB2292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow prosecutor's office to enter into agreements for supervision of people on diversion and allowing people on diversion to participate in the certified drug treatment program.
Title
Allow prosecutor's office to enter into agreements for supervision of people on diversion and allowing people on diversion to participate in the certified drug treatment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2292/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2292_00_0000.pdf |