KS HB2291 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing caps on damages in wrongful death actions and escalating them annually based on the consumer price index.
Title
Increasing caps on damages in wrongful death actions and escalating them annually based on the consumer price index.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2291/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2291_00_0000.pdf |