KS HB2290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a crime victims compensation division within the attorney general's office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a crime victims compensation division within the attorney general's office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 16, 2019
2019-05-29HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Reengrossed on Monday, May 6, 2019
2019-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2019-05-04HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-01SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
2019-05-01SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-05-01SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-04-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Rucker and Senator Miller appointed as conferees
2019-04-01HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Senator Haley raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 19, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-02-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-02-13HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-13HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2290/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2290_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2290_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2290_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2290_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2290_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190227095659_394623/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190327170038_736710/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190501144330_960653/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190505002534_017653/

Bill Comments

feedback