KS HB2280 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring approval of rules and regulations by the director of the budget and analysis of costs and any impact on business, and adding members to the state rules and regulations board and the joint committee on administrative rules and regulations..

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring approval of rules and regulations by the director of the budget and analysis of costs and any impact on business, and adding members to the state rules and regulations board and the joint committee on administrative rules and regulations..

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 98 Nay: 21 (Y: 98 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 23 Nay: 11 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 32 Nay: 5 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 8 (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Friday, May 18, 2018
2018-05-04HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2018
2018-05-03HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, May 3, 2018
2018-05-03HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 98 Nay: 21
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 11
2018-05-02SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2018-05-02SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2018-04-30HouseHouse Representative Highland and Representative Humphries are appointed to replace Representative Barker and Representative Highland on the Conference Committee
2018-04-06SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as second conferees
2018-04-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Barker, Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz appointed as second conferees
2017-06-03SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 5
2017-06-03SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2017-05-23SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator V. Schmidt, Senator Billinger and Senator Kelly appointed as conferees
2017-05-18HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz as conferees
2017-05-18HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-05-16SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 8
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was withdrawn
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
2017-05-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2017-05-15SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
2017-04-04SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, April 04, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 548-S
2017-03-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2017-03-28HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-03-09HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 09, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S
2017-02-06HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2017-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2280/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2280_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2280_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2280_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2280_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170328103010_611203/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170516102404_691118/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170603114756_184302/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180502162910_726054/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20180503133944_734353/

Bill Comments

feedback