KS HB2278 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - House Will become law without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2278 by Committee on Ways and Means - Prohibiting the carrying of concealed weapons in certain buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2278 by Committee on Ways and Means - Prohibiting the carrying of concealed weapons in certain buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-01 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 91 Nay: 33 (Y: 91 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Motion to nonconcur with amendments and appoint conferees failed - Yea: 33 Nay: 91 (Y: 33 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 24 Nay: 16 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 16 (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 23 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Senator Olson motioned to return jointly to Committees. The motion failed.. - Yea: 11 Nay: 27 (Y: 11 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected - Yea: 17 Nay: 20 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Masterson was rejected - Yea: 5 Nay: 29 (Y: 5 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 24 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Enacting clause be stricken - Yea: 12 Nay: 27 (Y: 12 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Berger was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 19 (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseHouse Will become law without Governor's signature
2017-06-05HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, June 05, 2017
2017-06-02HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, June 2, 2017
2017-06-01HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 91 Nay: 33
2017-06-01HouseHouse Motion to nonconcur with amendments and appoint conferees failed; Yea: 33 Nay: 91
2017-06-01HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-06-01SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 24 Nay: 16
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended Yea: 24 Nay: 16
2017-06-01SenateSenate Senator V. Schmidt raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pilcher-Cook was rejected
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pilcher-Cook
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hilderbrand was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 23
2017-06-01SenateSenate Senator V. Schmidt raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hilderbrand
2017-06-01SenateSenate Senator Olson motioned to return jointly to Committees. The motion failed.. Yea: 11 Nay: 27
2017-06-01SenateSenate Senator Rogers raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Alley
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was rejected Yea: 17 Nay: 20
2017-06-01SenateSenate Senator Hawk raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Masterson was rejected Yea: 5 Nay: 29
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Masterson
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wagle was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 24
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wagle
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Enacting clause be stricken Yea: 12 Nay: 27
2017-06-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2017-05-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion by Senator V. Schmidt to rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means passed
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bollier
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Berger was adopted Yea: 21 Nay: 19
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Berger
2017-05-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2017-05-16SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-23SenateSenate Hearing and possible action: Thursday, March 23, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2017-03-22SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
2017-03-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2017-02-23SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2017-02-23HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government
2017-02-16HouseHouse Hearing and possible action: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N
2017-02-06HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Local Government
2017-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2278/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2278_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2278_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2278_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2278_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2278_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170223105823_807219/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170516122929_182106/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601113724_180508/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601124039_063234/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601130604_570173/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601133445_045844/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601142214_051767/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601145006_550741/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601152116_440825/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601153645_585888/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601183913_635334/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170601190948_947472/

Bill Comments

feedback