KS HB2278 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing reference to the association of official analytical chemists in agricultural liming materials provisions.
Title
Removing reference to the association of official analytical chemists in agricultural liming materials provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 18, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2015-02-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2278/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2278_00_0000.pdf |