KS HB2274 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring notification to patients that the effects of a medication abortion may be reversible.
Title
Requiring notification to patients that the effects of a medication abortion may be reversible.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 85 Nay: 39 (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carlin was rejected - Yea: 42 Nay: 81 (Y: 42 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected - Yea: 42 Nay: 82 (Y: 42 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Horn was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 83 (Y: 41 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carlin was rejected - Yea: 42 Nay: 81 (Y: 42 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected - Yea: 42 Nay: 82 (Y: 42 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Horn was rejected - Yea: 41 Nay: 83 (Y: 41 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 85 Nay: 39 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, March 25, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carlin was rejected Yea: 42 Nay: 81 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carlin |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Parker was rejected Yea: 42 Nay: 82 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Parker |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Horn was rejected Yea: 41 Nay: 83 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Horn |
2019-03-25 | House | House Representative Bergquist raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Neighbor |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2019-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-02-12 | House | House Introduced |