KS HB2273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas no-call act; restrictions on use of automatic dialing-announcing devices.
Title
Kansas no-call act; restrictions on use of automatic dialing-announcing devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 18, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 548-S |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 08, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | House | House Introduced |