KS HB2272 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a KPERS working after retirement exemption for retirants employed by a community developmental disability organization in a licensed professional nurse, licensed practical nurse or direct support position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a KPERS working after retirement exemption for retirants employed by a community developmental disability organization in a licensed professional nurse, licensed practical nurse or direct support position.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-23HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2023-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2023-02-15HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
2023-02-02HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2023-02-02HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback