KS HB2265 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales tax exemption for required textbooks and authorizing a local sales tax on required textbooks.
Title
Providing a sales tax exemption for required textbooks and authorizing a local sales tax on required textbooks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-08 | House | House Introduced |