KS HB2262 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of corrections requests for law enforcement assistance from jurisdictions outside the state of Kansas.
Title
Department of corrections requests for law enforcement assistance from jurisdictions outside the state of Kansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2017-02-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2017-02-02 | House | House Introduced |