KS HB2254 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the definition of land devoted to agricultural use for property tax purposes to include properties used as part of registered agritourism activities.
Title
Amending the definition of land devoted to agricultural use for property tax purposes to include properties used as part of registered agritourism activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 106 Nay: 18 (Y: 106 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-04-03 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 30, 2023 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-03-29 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 106 Nay: 18 |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith, A. was adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith, A. |
2023-03-28 | House | House Representative Probst raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Corbet |
2023-03-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2023-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-02-01 | House | House Introduced |