KS HB2249 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Setting the protected income level for persons receiving home and community-based services at 150% of federal supplemental security income.
Title
Setting the protected income level for persons receiving home and community-based services at 150% of federal supplemental security income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 152-S |
2021-02-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Social Services Budget |
2021-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | House | House Introduced |