KS HB2246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed; Yea: 7 Nay: 114 (Remains in Conference)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Changing the requirements to begin production on distinctive license plates and providing for the proud educator, alpha kappa alpha, knights of Columbus and current and veteran members of the United States army, navy, marine corps, air force and coast guard license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the requirements to begin production on distinctive license plates and providing for the proud educator, alpha kappa alpha, knights of Columbus and current and veteran members of the United States army, navy, marine corps, air force and coast guard license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed - Yea: 7 Nay: 114 (Y: 7 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseHouse Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed; Yea: 7 Nay: 114 (Remains in Conference)
2019-04-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
2019-04-01HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Thimesch and Representative Helgerson as conferees
2019-03-26SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Braun was adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Braun
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 1
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-02-20HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-12HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback