KS HB2246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending oversight, administration and regulation of certain duties, responsibilities and activities of the insurance department relating to risk-based capital instructions, definition of long-term care insurance, conversion plans of reciprocals to mutual insurance companies, appointment and removal of securities commissioner and assessing penalties from excess lines and creating and authorizing certain transfers to the cancer research and public information trust fund for the university of Kansas medical center and changing the rate of the hospital provider assessment imposed by the department of health and environment and granting Wichita state university bonding authority for certain capital improvement projects.
Title
Amending oversight, administration and regulation of certain duties, responsibilities and activities of the insurance department relating to risk-based capital instructions, definition of long-term care insurance, conversion plans of reciprocals to mutual insurance companies, appointment and removal of securities commissioner and assessing penalties from excess lines and creating and authorizing certain transfers to the cancer research and public information trust fund for the university of Kansas medical center and changing the rate of the hospital provider assessment imposed by the department of health and environment and granting Wichita state university bonding authority for certain capital improvement projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 112 Nay: 2 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed - Yea: 7 Nay: 114 (Y: 7 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed - Yea: 7 Nay: 114 (Y: 7 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, June 1, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 26, 2020 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 112 Nay: 2 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Senator McGinn, Senator Billinger, and Senator Hawk are appointed to replace Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard, and Senator Pettey on the Conference Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Wolfe Moore are appointed to replace Representative Proehl, Representative Thimesch, and Representative Helgerson on the Conference Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2019-04-05 | House | House Motion to concur with amendments in conference failed; Yea: 7 Nay: 114 (Remains in Conference) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees |
2019-04-01 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Thimesch and Representative Helgerson as conferees |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Braun was adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Braun |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-12 | House | House Introduced |