KS HB2244 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for the effective disposal of industrial hemp and requiring industrial hemp processors to register with the state fire marshal.
Title
Establishing requirements for the effective disposal of industrial hemp and requiring industrial hemp processors to register with the state fire marshal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 101 Nay: 22 (Y: 101 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 97 Nay: 27 (Y: 97 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 97 Nay: 27 (Y: 97 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | House Reengrossed on Saturday, April 10, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 101 Nay: 22 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 3 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Kerschen, Senator Straub and Senator Ware appointed as conferees |
2021-04-07 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Rahjes , Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carlin as conferees |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kerschen was adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kerschen |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-26 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 97 Nay: 27 |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-02-04 | House | House Introduced |