KS HB2244 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2244 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the COVID-19 response and reopening for business liability protection act.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2244 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the COVID-19 response and reopening for business liability protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 89 Nay: 35 (Y: 89 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 89 Nay: 35 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | House | House Introduced |