KS HB2244 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2244 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the COVID-19 response and reopening for business liability protection act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2244 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the COVID-19 response and reopening for business liability protection act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 89 Nay: 35 (Y: 89 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateSenate Died on Senate General Orders
2020-05-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2020-05-21SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 89 Nay: 35
2019-03-27HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-03-06HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback