KS HB2242 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the percentage amount the state fire marshal may levy on fire insurance company premiums caused by fire business being transacted in Kansas.
Title
Increasing the percentage amount the state fire marshal may levy on fire insurance company premiums caused by fire business being transacted in Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-02-04 | House | House Introduced |