KS HB2241 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting insurance companies from canceling or nonrenewing property and casualty policies due to claims arising from natural causes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting insurance companies from canceling or nonrenewing property and casualty policies due to claims arising from natural causes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01HouseHouse Died in Committee
2015-02-26HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-12HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 16, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 152S
2015-02-05HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2015-02-05HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback