KS HB2241 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Renewable energy portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy portfolio standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2013-03-08HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Energy and Environment
2013-03-01HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Utilities and Telecommunications; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Referred to Committee on Utilities and Telecommunications
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2013-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2013-02-26HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
2013-02-08HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
2013-02-06HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Energy and Environment
2013-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback