KS HB2239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Liquor sales by licensees in common consumption areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor sales by licensees in common consumption areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 3 (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 3
2019-02-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government
2019-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2019-02-12HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-12HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback