KS HB2237 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 5, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 5, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas affordable housing tax credit act, the Kansas housing investor tax credit act, the historic Kansas act, the Kansas rural home loan guarantee act, authorizing certain residential real property appraisals in rural counties to be performed without completing the sales comparison approach to value, allowing the use of bond proceeds under the Kansas rural housing incentive district act for residential vertical development and renovation of certain buildings within economically distressed urban areas and expanding eligibility for the child day care services assistance tax credit and providing a credit for employer payments to an organization providing access to employees for child day care services.
Title
Enacting the Kansas affordable housing tax credit act, the Kansas housing investor tax credit act, the historic Kansas act, the Kansas rural home loan guarantee act, authorizing certain residential real property appraisals in rural counties to be performed without completing the sales comparison approach to value, allowing the use of bond proceeds under the Kansas rural housing incentive district act for residential vertical development and renovation of certain buildings within economically distressed urban areas and expanding eligibility for the child day care services assistance tax credit and providing a credit for employer payments to an organization providing access to employees for child day care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 109 Nay: 12 (Y: 109 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 5 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 107 Nay: 16 (Y: 107 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 34 Nay: 3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 32 Nay: 5 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 107 Nay: 16 (Y: 107 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 5, 2022 |
2022-05-23 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 29, 2022 |
2022-04-28 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 109 Nay: 12 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 3 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2022-03-30 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelly , Representative Hoheisel and Representative Xu as conferees |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 5 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Senator Pittman raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Senator Pittman raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-24 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 107 Nay: 16 |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 15, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2021-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-02-04 | House | House Introduced |