KS HB2236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing exclusion of the sales comparison approach in mortgage financing appraisals of certain unique residential real property in rural counties.
Title
Authorizing exclusion of the sales comparison approach in mortgage financing appraisals of certain unique residential real property in rural counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-18 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2021-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 15, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 218-N - CANCELED |
2021-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-02-04 | House | House Introduced |