KS HB2234 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring medical directors of emergency medical services to provide medical oversight of such services and emergency medical service providers.
Title
Requiring medical directors of emergency medical services to provide medical oversight of such services and emergency medical service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 18, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hearing: (proponents) Monday, February 22, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2021-02-04 | House | House Introduced |