KS HB2233 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 28 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 28 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electric utilities and carbon dioxide emissions.
Title
Electric utilities and carbon dioxide emissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 1 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 3 (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 1 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 34 Nay: 3 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 3 (Y: 121 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 28 , 2015 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | House | House Reengrossed on Friday, May 15 , 2015 |
2015-05-14 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 1 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Petersen and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees |
2015-05-06 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hedke , Representative Corbet and Representative Kuether as conferees |
2015-05-06 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 3 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, April 02, 2015, 8:00 AM Room 548-S |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-03-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 3 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 24 , 2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy and Environment |
2015-03-12 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Energy and Environment |
2015-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy and Environment |
2015-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 18, 2015, 9:00 AM Room 582-N |
2015-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Energy and Environment |
2015-02-04 | House | House Introduced |