KS HB2232 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing professional liability insurance to teachers.
Title
Providing professional liability insurance to teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2013-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N |
2013-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 15, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N -CANCELLED |
2013-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-06 | House | House Introduced |