KS HB2230 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing K.S.A. 68-1038.
Title
Repealing K.S.A. 68-1038.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2011-03-28 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-21 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-21 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 1 | |
2011-02-18 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced |