KS HB2229 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the criminal penalties for multiple thefts of mail.
Title
Increasing the criminal penalties for multiple thefts of mail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | House | House Introduced |