KS HB2229 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the admission into evidence of any tape or recording created using an electronic monitoring device in an adult care home.
Title
Concerning the admission into evidence of any tape or recording created using an electronic monitoring device in an adult care home.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Children and Seniors; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED |
2019-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2019-02-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2229/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2229_00_0000.pdf |