KS HB2228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt a policy regarding submission of sexual assault evidence kits and allowing evidence collection at child advocacy centers or other facilities.
Title
Requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt a policy regarding submission of sexual assault evidence kits and allowing evidence collection at child advocacy centers or other facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Reengrossed on Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Senator Hilderbrand raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holscher |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 26, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-03-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 15, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-03 | House | House Introduced |