KS HB2221 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a bridge on United States highway 77 in Cowley county as the SGT Kevin Gilbertson veterans memorial bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on United States highway 77 in Cowley county as the SGT Kevin Gilbertson veterans memorial bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2221/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2221_00_0000.pdf |