KS HB2218 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
Pending: House K-12 Education Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Sunflower education equity act to provide education savings accounts for qualified students in Kansas.
Title
Establishing the Sunflower education equity act to provide education savings accounts for qualified students in Kansas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 6, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 546-S |
2023-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget |
2023-01-30 | House | House Introduced |