KS HB2218 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Updating the membership and responsibilities of the Kansas state employees health care commission and requiring the commission to make certain reports and recommendations to the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating the membership and responsibilities of the Kansas state employees health care commission and requiring the commission to make certain reports and recommendations to the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Friday, April 23, 2021
2021-05-03HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
2021-05-03HouseHouse Engrossed on Monday, April 12, 2021
2021-04-09HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2021-04-09SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 4
2021-04-09SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2021-04-07SenateSenate Senator McGinn and Senator Kerschen are appointed to replace Senator Billinger and Senator Claeys on the Conference Committee
2021-04-06SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees
2021-04-06HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative S. Johnson , Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor as conferees
2021-03-30SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
2021-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-24SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED
2021-03-22SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2021-03-10SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-05SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2021-03-04HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2021-02-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Pensions
2021-02-24HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
2021-02-03HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
2021-02-03HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2218/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2218_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2218_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2218_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2218_h_1423.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_hb2218_s_1903.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_hb2218_s_2190.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2218_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2218_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2218_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccrb_hb2218_01_sehp.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_hb_2218_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210304134916_498966/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210330143123_398348/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210409133126_613658/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210409143417_002774/

Bill Comments 750

feedback